NY S03105 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the offense of criminal possession of marihuana in the fifth degree.
Title
Relates to the offense of criminal possession of marihuana in the fifth degree.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3105A |
2013-05-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2013-03-15 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2013-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06716 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.318