NY S03094 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the composition of boards of elections.
Title
Relates to the composition of boards of elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-04-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06597 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary