NY S03087 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the state education commissioner to require public schools districts to report on compliance with art education instruction requirements.
Title
Directs the state education commissioner to require public schools districts to report on compliance with art education instruction requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1707 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3087A |
2018-06-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |