NY S03085 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-08 - SIGNED CHAP.488
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-08 - SIGNED CHAP.488
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of income property owners may earn for the purpose of eligibility for the property tax exemption for persons over sixty-five years of age and persons with disabilities and limited income.
Title
Increases the amount of income property owners may earn for the purpose of eligibility for the property tax exemption for persons over sixty-five years of age and persons with disabilities and limited income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.488 |
2022-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.395 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a3956a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.974 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3085A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2021-02-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.331 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A03956 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - substituted by s3085a