NY S03081 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits selling a drug subject to a shortage for an unconscionably excessive price.
Title
Prohibits selling a drug subject to a shortage for an unconscionably excessive price.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.162 |
2022-12-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.528 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a5860b |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3081B |
2022-05-25 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3081A |
2022-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.461 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1528 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05860 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s3081b