NY S03080 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3080A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3080A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to excluding tax levies necessary for expenditures increasing school safety or security from the school district tax levy limit.
Title
Relates to excluding tax levies necessary for expenditures increasing school safety or security from the school district tax levy limit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3080A |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06102 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - enacting clause stricken
A10096 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - referred to education
A10096 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - referred to education