NY S03078 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the installation and testing of fire protection systems at pet stores.
Title
Requires the installation and testing of fire protection systems at pet stores.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.609 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3078A |
2019-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.198 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A00998 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture