NY S03067 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Subject to an appropriation for the 2017-18 state fiscal year, provides that farmers shall receive an exemption from tolls when transporting products to the city of New York for consumption in such city.
Title
Subject to an appropriation for the 2017-18 state fiscal year, provides that farmers shall receive an exemption from tolls when transporting products to the city of New York for consumption in such city.
Sponsors
Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1542 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3067A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2015-05-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01494 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - print number 1494a