NY S03064 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting individuals enrolled in the federal deferred action for childhood arrivals program to apply for professional licenses if they meet all additional requirements.
Title
Relates to permitting individuals enrolled in the federal deferred action for childhood arrivals program to apply for professional licenses if they meet all additional requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1131 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |