NY S03064 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - 2ND REPORT CAL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities, including membership requirements and powers and duties of the task force; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities, including membership requirements and powers and duties of the task force; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.403
2019-04-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 3064A
2019-04-02SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2019-02-01SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback