NY S03064 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities, including membership requirements and powers and duties of the task force; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities, including membership requirements and powers and duties of the task force; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2019-05-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.403
2019-04-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 3064A
2019-04-02SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2019-02-01SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback