NY S03057 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ties the rate of interest on a judgment for medical debt to the one-year United States treasury bill rate.
Title
Ties the rate of interest on a judgment for medical debt to the one-year United States treasury bill rate.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1000 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3057A |
2021-05-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01538 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - enacting clause stricken