NY S03057 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the payment of certain volunteer firefighter and volunteer ambulance worker death benefits shall be within ninety days of the filing of application to receive such death benefit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the payment of certain volunteer firefighter and volunteer ambulance worker death benefits shall be within ninety days of the filing of application to receive such death benefit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Assemblyreferred to local governments
2019-03-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.208
2019-02-01SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A00550 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - referred to local governments

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback