NY S03052 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expungement of records for certain juveniles convicted of a nonviolent offense after seven years and satisfactory completion of his or her probation, parole, supervised release and payment of any fines imposed or restitution ordered, whichever is later.
Title
Relates to expungement of records for certain juveniles convicted of a nonviolent offense after seven years and satisfactory completion of his or her probation, parole, supervised release and payment of any fines imposed or restitution ordered, whichever is later.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-12-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3052A |
2019-12-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08907 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - print number 8907a