NY S03024 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a permit for a memorial lands facility.
Title
Provides a permit for a memorial lands facility.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Mario Mattera [R] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2024-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.637 |
2024-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3024B |
2024-01-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-15 | Senate | AMENDED 3024A |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.817 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07104 (Same As) 2024-01-22 - print number 7104b