NY S03023 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases state assistance payments for county approved agricultural and farmland protection plans, from 75% to 85% of the cost thereof.
Title
Increases state assistance payments for county approved agricultural and farmland protection plans, from 75% to 85% of the cost thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1179 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |