NY S03019 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A735
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A735
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioners of health and environmental conservation to study and develop a long term strategy to encourage and promote outdoor environmental education and recreational opportunities in New York state.
Title
Directs the commissioners of health and environmental conservation to study and develop a long term strategy to encourage and promote outdoor environmental education and recreational opportunities in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A735 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2016 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00735 (Same As) 2017-09-12 - signed chap.276