NY S03005 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to improving and expanding the pharmaceutical insurance coverage program for certain medicare enrollees; creates the expanded pharmaceutical insurance coverage panel, to be responsible for expanding pharmaceutical insurance coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to improving and expanding the pharmaceutical insurance coverage program for certain medicare enrollees; creates the expanded pharmaceutical insurance coverage panel, to be responsible for expanding pharmaceutical insurance coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 3005A
2024-01-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO AGING
2023-05-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH
2023-01-26SenateREFERRED TO AGING

Same As/Similar To

A06450 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to aging

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback