NY S02997 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the installation or use of solar power systems within a homeowners' association.
Title
Relates to the installation or use of solar power systems within a homeowners' association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.342 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.123 |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | substituted for a1933 |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.200 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01933 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - substituted by s2997