NY S02995 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "Shepherd Patterson law"; requires a physician who treats a minor patient with a medical condition that may cause a disability to provide certain educational information to such patient's parents or guardians indicating such minor is entitled to a free and appropriate public education as defined under section five hundred four of the federal rehabilitation act of nineteen hundred seventy-three; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "Shepherd Patterson law"; requires a physician who treats a minor patient with a medical condition that may cause a disability to provide certain educational information to such patient's parents or guardians indicating such minor is entitled to a free and appropriate public education as defined under section five hundred four of the federal rehabilitation act of nineteen hundred seventy-three; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-16Assemblyreferred to health
2024-04-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-04-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-02-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-02-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-02-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.449
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-03-30Assemblyreferred to health
2023-03-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-03-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-03-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-03-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-03-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.523
2023-01-26SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A04034 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback