NY S02991 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town board of the town of Lewisboro, county of Westchester to establish certain speed limits on rural major and minor collector roads at twenty-five miles per hour.
Title
Authorizes the town board of the town of Lewisboro, county of Westchester to establish certain speed limits on rural major and minor collector roads at twenty-five miles per hour.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2022-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.777 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.749 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07944 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to transportation