NY S02980 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.82
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the legal regulated rent for the combination of two or more vacant apartments; defines permanently vacated; relates to exemptions from rent stabilization on the basis of substantial rehabilitation; relates to public hearings by the city rent agency (Part A); relates to clearly defining the scope of the fraud exception to the pre-HSTPA four-year rule for calculating rents (Part B); relates to the failure of owners to file rent registration statements and the enforcement powers of the commissioner of housing and community renewal (Part C).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the legal regulated rent for the combination of two or more vacant apartments; defines permanently vacated; relates to exemptions from rent stabilization on the basis of substantial rehabilitation; relates to public hearings by the city rent agency (Part A); relates to clearly defining the scope of the fraud exception to the pre-HSTPA four-year rule for calculating rents (Part B); relates to the failure of owners to file rent registration statements and the enforcement powers of the commissioner of housing and community renewal (Part C).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-22SenateAPPROVAL MEMO.82
2023-12-22SenateSIGNED CHAP.760
2023-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.864
2023-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a6216b
2023-06-09Assemblyreferred to codes
2023-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-22SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2980C
2023-05-09SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-03Senate1ST REPORT CAL.747
2023-04-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 2980B
2023-04-26SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2023-03-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 2980A
2023-03-07SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2023-01-26SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A06216 (Same As) 2023-06-20 - substituted by s2980c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2980
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02980&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02980
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02980&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02980A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02980&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02980B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02980&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02980C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2980#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S2980#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02980&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback