NY S02980 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of health, in cooperation with various state offices and agencies to review, evaluate, and make recommendations concerning the prescribing and treatment history of persons in this state who suffered fatal and nonfatal opiate overdoses.
Title
Directs the department of health, in cooperation with various state offices and agencies to review, evaluate, and make recommendations concerning the prescribing and treatment history of persons in this state who suffered fatal and nonfatal opiate overdoses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2980A |
2021-05-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A00606 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to health