NY S02979 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the incorporation of the "Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association of Huntington Manor".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the incorporation of the "Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association of Huntington Manor".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.347
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a4742a
2019-05-29Assemblyreferred to local governments
2019-05-29AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-29SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-05-21SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2979A
2019-05-21SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-21Senatereturned to senate
2019-05-21AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-03-12Assemblyreferred to local governments
2019-03-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.207
2019-01-31SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A04742 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s2979a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02979&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02979&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02979
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02979&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02979A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2979#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2979#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2979#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02979&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback