NY S02961 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2930
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2930
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization for the city of White Plains to impose an additional one-quarter of one percent sales and compensating use tax.
Title
Extends authorization for the city of White Plains to impose an additional one-quarter of one percent sales and compensating use tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2930 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.760 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02930 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - signed chap.28