NY S02939 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disclosure of information relating to natural siblings of adopted persons.
Title
Relates to disclosure of information relating to natural siblings of adopted persons.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.338 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02767 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to judiciary