NY S02933 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-29 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that a copy of every assessment or evaluation conducted to determine a recipient's need for home care assistance shall be promptly provided to the recipient or the recipient's designee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that a copy of every assessment or evaluation conducted to determine a recipient's need for home care assistance shall be promptly provided to the recipient or the recipient's designee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-29Assemblyreferred to health
2024-05-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-02-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-02-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-02-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.382
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2023-01-25SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback