NY S02925 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to impose higher civil penalties upon motor carriers who fail to report to the commissioner of motor vehicles certain disqualifying violations by bus drivers employed by such carrier.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to impose higher civil penalties upon motor carriers who fail to report to the commissioner of motor vehicles certain disqualifying violations by bus drivers employed by such carrier.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2022-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.237 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.284 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03228 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to transportation