NY S02924 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3144A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3144A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the accessible electronic information act for blind and disabled persons; creates a new fund in the state finance law; authorizes a not-for-profit entity to administer the program.
Title
Enacts the accessible electronic information act for blind and disabled persons; creates a new fund in the state finance law; authorizes a not-for-profit entity to administer the program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. John Mannion [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3144A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1742 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2924A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03144 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - tabled