NY S02912 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - SIGNED CHAP.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the village of Saranac Lake to grant easements over certain park lands for the purpose of operating a waterworks system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the village of Saranac Lake to grant easements over certain park lands for the purpose of operating a waterworks system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-08AssemblySIGNED CHAP.64
2011-05-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2011-05-23Assemblyreturned to senate
2011-05-23Assemblypassed assembly
2011-05-23Assemblyhome rule request
2011-05-23Assemblyordered to third reading cal.385
2011-05-23Assemblysubstituted for a4297
2011-03-23Assemblyreferred to local governments
2011-03-23SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-03-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-03-23SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2011-03-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2011-03-02Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2011-03-01Senate1ST REPORT CAL.103
2011-02-03SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

Same As/Similar To

A04297 (Same As) 2011-05-23 - substituted by s2912

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback