NY S02911 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the autism detection, education and mapping program.
Title
Provides for the autism detection, education and mapping program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1953 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1527 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01953 (Same As) 2021-12-29 - approval memo.154