NY S02908 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state university trustees to offer separate tuition rates to certain non-resident undergraduate students attending the state university college of arts and sciences at Potsdam.
Title
Authorizes the state university trustees to offer separate tuition rates to certain non-resident undergraduate students attending the state university college of arts and sciences at Potsdam.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.474 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08220 (Same As) 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in higher education