NY S02906 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.278
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.278
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the Ferguson, Moyer, Mud Creek, Ninemile Creek, Oriskany, Reall, Sauquoit, Six Mile Creek, and Wood Creek as creeks within the definition of "inland waterways" for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Includes the Ferguson, Moyer, Mud Creek, Ninemile Creek, Oriskany, Reall, Sauquoit, Six Mile Creek, and Wood Creek as creeks within the definition of "inland waterways" for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.278 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.227 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2906A |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-05-30 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-22 | Senate | amended on third reading (t) 6963a |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.358 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-28 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6963A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2906A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.227 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04364 (Same As) 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
A06963 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.278
A06963 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.278