NY S02900 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a green development neighborhood tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a green development neighborhood tax exemption.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.206
2019-01-30SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A00049 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - referred to real property taxation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback