NY S02889 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of the department of health to provide educational materials on the department's website concerning the state's public drinking water systems and to participate in the federal drinking water watch program.
Title
Requires the commissioner of the department of health to provide educational materials on the department's website concerning the state's public drinking water systems and to participate in the federal drinking water watch program.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2889B |
2017-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2017-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2889A |
2017-05-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02600 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - REFERRED TO HEALTH