NY S02884 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of consumer credit history in hiring, employment and licensing determinations.
Title
Prohibits the use of consumer credit history in hiring, employment and licensing determinations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.577 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2884E |
2020-02-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2884D |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2884C |
2019-05-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2884B |
2019-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.221 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2884A |
2019-02-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02611 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES