NY S02877 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits certain financial institutions from charging a fee for periodic paper statements when such statements are required for an application for public assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain financial institutions from charging a fee for periodic paper statements when such statements are required for an application for public assistance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1300
2024-05-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 2877A
2024-05-15SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO BANKS
2023-01-25SenateREFERRED TO BANKS

Same As/Similar To

A05019 (Same As) 2024-05-20 - RECOMMITTED TO BANKS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback