NY S02875 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending certain provisions relating to exemption from taxation of alterations and improvements to multiple dwellings.
Title
Relates to extending certain provisions relating to exemption from taxation of alterations and improvements to multiple dwellings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06908 (Same As) 2021-09-15 - enacting clause stricken