NY S02869 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires financial reports for real property acquired by the state, including any agencies and authorities, through eminent domain.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires financial reports for real property acquired by the state, including any agencies and authorities, through eminent domain.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2024-02-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-02-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-02-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.430
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2023-06-10SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1241
2023-01-25SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A10289 (Same As) 2024-05-17 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback