NY S02866 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a pension benefit parity payment to certain retirees from a state management/confidential position.
Title
Provides a pension benefit parity payment to certain retirees from a state management/confidential position.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04885 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental employees