NY S02862 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to offer real property tax credits to certain volunteers who live in one municipality but who serve in neighboring municipalities.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to offer real property tax credits to certain volunteers who live in one municipality but who serve in neighboring municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. Steven Rhoads [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.308 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02121 (Same As) 2023-01-23 - referred to real property taxation