NY S02857 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the limitation on highway expenses in the town of Smithtown.
Title
Relates to the limitation on highway expenses in the town of Smithtown.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1336 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08353 (Same As) 2020-06-09 - REFERRED TO RULES