NY S02852 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - SIGNED CHAP.510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the defense and indemnification of certain nonjudicial employees certified by the office of court administration and paid by the city of New York to serve as a guardian ad litem in an action or proceeding pending in the housing part of the civil court of the city of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the defense and indemnification of certain nonjudicial employees certified by the office of court administration and paid by the city of New York to serve as a guardian ad litem in an action or proceeding pending in the housing part of the civil court of the city of New York.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 SIGNED CHAP.510
2010-09-07 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-07-01 returned to senate
2010-07-01 passed assembly
2010-07-01 ordered to third reading rules cal.540
2010-07-01 substituted for a10773
2010-02-08 referred to governmental employees
2010-02-08 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-02-08 PASSED SENATE
2010-02-02 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2010-02-01 2ND REPORT CAL.
2010-01-26 1ST REPORT CAL.49
2010-01-06 REFERRED TO FINANCE
2009-03-04 REFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A10773 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - substituted by s2852

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback