NY S02849 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the repossession of motor vehicles and mobile homes for certain persons suffering financial hardship as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic until the expiration of the restrictions on business and places of public accommodation in the county of the buyer under executive order 202 of 2020, or December 31, 2021, whichever is later.
Title
Restricts the repossession of motor vehicles and mobile homes for certain persons suffering financial hardship as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic until the expiration of the restrictions on business and places of public accommodation in the county of the buyer under executive order 202 of 2020, or December 31, 2021, whichever is later.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-04-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2849B |
2021-04-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2849A |
2021-04-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |