NY S02847 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to utilization review program standards; requires use of evidence-based and peer reviewed clinical review criteria; amends provisions relating to prescription drug formulary changes and pre-authorization for certain health care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to utilization review program standards; requires use of evidence-based and peer reviewed clinical review criteria; amends provisions relating to prescription drug formulary changes and pre-authorization for certain health care services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.835
2019-01-29SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A03038 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - referred to insurance

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback