NY S02847 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.187
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an interagency council for the purpose of coordinated planning on issues related to older adults which shall assess current programs and services across multiple agencies and shall consider current and projected needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an interagency council for the purpose of coordinated planning on issues related to older adults which shall assess current programs and services across multiple agencies and shall consider current and projected needs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29AssemblyVETOED MEMO.187
2017-11-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.495
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a6976
2017-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1435
2017-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-01-17SenateREFERRED TO AGING

Same As/Similar To

A06976 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s2847

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback