NY S02845 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2845A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2845A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals certain sections of the general municipal law, in relation to urban renewal agencies and industrial development agencies; repeals certain sections of the public authorities law, in relation to certain authorities; repeals certain sections of the transportation law, in relation to the Utica transit authority; transfers any books, records and remaining rights of any dissolved facility to an identifiable location.
Title
Repeals certain sections of the general municipal law, in relation to urban renewal agencies and industrial development agencies; repeals certain sections of the public authorities law, in relation to certain authorities; repeals certain sections of the transportation law, in relation to the Utica transit authority; transfers any books, records and remaining rights of any dissolved facility to an identifiable location.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrea Stewart-Cousins [D] | Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] |
Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2845A |
2012-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07064 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - print number 7064a