NY S02842 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-22 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-22 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a class E felony for the sale to a minor of an alcoholic beverage containing a stimulant when such sale is made by a licensee of the state liquor authority.
Title
Establishes a class E felony for the sale to a minor of an alcoholic beverage containing a stimulant when such sale is made by a licensee of the state liquor authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2012-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1525 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.221 |
2011-02-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05170 (Same As) 2012-05-15 - held for consideration in economic development