NY S02837 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5448
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5448
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes employers to make deductions from an employee's wages if such deduction is authorized by the employee and is for the convenience of the employee.
Title
Authorizes employers to make deductions from an employee's wages if such deduction is authorized by the employee and is for the convenience of the employee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5448 |
2011-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.820 |
2011-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05448 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to labor