NY S02829 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires debt collectors to send consumers a written notice of their rights under state law along with their initial debt collection correspondence; such notice would contain information such as who and when a principal creditor may contact a debtor about the debt owed as well as the fact that a principal creditor cannot disclose information affecting a consumer debtor's reputation for creditworthiness if the principal creditor knows or has reason to know such information is false; applies to consumer rather than commercial debts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires debt collectors to send consumers a written notice of their rights under state law along with their initial debt collection correspondence; such notice would contain information such as who and when a principal creditor may contact a debtor about the debt owed as well as the fact that a principal creditor cannot disclose information affecting a consumer debtor's reputation for creditworthiness if the principal creditor knows or has reason to know such information is false; applies to consumer rather than commercial debts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2019-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2829B
2019-06-03SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2829A
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.547
2019-01-29SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A00876 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - advanced to third reading cal.275

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02829&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02829&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02829
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02829&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02829A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02829&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02829B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2829#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2829#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2829#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback